Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Labor and Industry, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Occupational Safety and Health - Good Faith Actions by Business Owners - Penalty Forgiveness
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 (SB0305/CH0224)
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0317
Title
State Government - E-Verify Program
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0330 (SB0555)
Title
Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0698)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1130 /CH0541 (SB0758/CH0540)
Title
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1204 (SB0683)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1283
Title
Prevailing Wage Enforcement Act
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1317
Title
Labor and Employment - Division of Labor and Industry - Appropriations
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296)
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0553 /CH0499
Title
Tipped Employees - Payments or Deduction from Wages - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0555 (HB0330)
Title
Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683 (HB1204)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 (HB0735)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 /CH0540 (HB1130/CH0541)
Title
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 Occupational Safety and Health - Good Faith Actions by Business Owners - Penalty Forgiveness Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0296 (SB0305/CH0224) Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0317 State Government - E-Verify Program Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0330 (SB0555) Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work Contracts Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 (SB0698) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1130 /CH0541 (SB0758/CH0540) Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - Establishment Delegate Barnes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
HB1204 (SB0683) Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1283 Prevailing Wage Enforcement Act Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1317 Labor and Employment - Division of Labor and Industry - Appropriations Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296) Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Finance
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0553 /CH0499 Tipped Employees - Payments or Deduction from Wages - Prohibition Senator Getty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0555 (HB0330) Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work Contracts Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Repeal Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 (HB1204) Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0698 (HB0735) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 /CH0540 (HB1130/CH0541) Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - Establishment Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM