Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Labor and Industry, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 (SB0293/CH0288)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0467 /CH0100
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment of Minors
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527
Title
Labor and Employment - Earned Sick Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0579 /CH0411
Title
Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Authority - Enforcement of Local Minimum Wage Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0725 (SB0883)
Title
State-Owned Airport Concessionaire Employees - Payment of Wages and Other Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0956
Title
Prevailing Wage Enforcement Act
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968 (SB0753)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1026 /CH0334 (SB0737/CH0333)
Title
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1207 /CH0646
Title
Division of Labor and Industry - Youth Apprenticeship Advisory Committee
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1293
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Servers - Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 /CH0120
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training Council
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293 /CH0288 (HB0257)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737 /CH0333 (HB1026/CH0334)
Title
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0753 (HB0968)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB0725)
Title
State-Owned Airport Concessionaire Employees - Payment of Wages and Other Rights
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0257 (SB0293/CH0288) Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0467 /CH0100 Labor and Employment - Employment of Minors Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Economic Matters
2/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0527 Labor and Employment - Earned Sick Leave Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0579 /CH0411 Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Authority - Enforcement of Local Minimum Wage Laws Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0725 (SB0883) State-Owned Airport Concessionaire Employees - Payment of Wages and Other Rights Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0956 Prevailing Wage Enforcement Act Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0968 (SB0753) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1026 /CH0334 (SB0737/CH0333) Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1207 /CH0646 Division of Labor and Industry - Youth Apprenticeship Advisory Committee Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 646
Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1293 Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Servers - Registration Delegate Vaughn 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0054 /CH0120 Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training Council Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0204 Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2014 Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0293 /CH0288 (HB0257) Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0371 Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Senator Currie 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 PM
SB0737 /CH0333 (HB1026/CH0334) Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0753 (HB0968) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0883 (HB0725) State-Owned Airport Concessionaire Employees - Payment of Wages and Other Rights Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM