Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Labor and Industry, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0197 (SB0623)
Title
Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343 (SB0993)
Title
Procurement - Equal Pay Certificates - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 (SB0711)
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977
Title
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 /CH0557 (SB0481/CH0556)
Title
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1004 /CH0639
Title
Equal Pay Commission - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 (SB0940)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Repeal of Tip Credit (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1442
Title
Payment of Wages - Use of Debit Cards and Card Accounts - Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1615 (SB1126/CH0470)
Title
Frederick County - Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High School
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0342
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for Fraud
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 /CH0343
Title
Planned Apprenticeship Standards and On-the-Job Training Activities - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 (HB0092)
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0481 /CH0556 (HB1003/CH0557)
Title
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0623 (HB0197)
Title
Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0711 (HB0721)
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940 (HB1372)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Repeal of Tip Credit
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0993 (HB0343)
Title
Procurement - Equal Pay Certificates - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1126 /CH0470 (HB1615)
Title
Frederick County - Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High School
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0197 (SB0623) Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2016 Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0343 (SB0993) Procurement - Equal Pay Certificates - Requirement Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0721 (SB0711) Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016 Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0977 Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 /CH0557 (SB0481/CH0556) Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Economic Matters
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1004 /CH0639 Equal Pay Commission - Establishment Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Economic Matters
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 (SB0940) Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Repeal of Tip Credit (Fight for Fifteen) Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1442 Payment of Wages - Use of Debit Cards and Card Accounts - Regulations Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1615 (SB1126/CH0470) Frederick County - Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High School Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0090 /CH0342 Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for Fraud Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0092 /CH0343 Planned Apprenticeship Standards and On-the-Job Training Activities - Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0275 (HB0092) Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0481 /CH0556 (HB1003/CH0557) Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Finance
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0623 (HB0197) Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2016 Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0711 (HB0721) Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016 Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0940 (HB1372) Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Repeal of Tip Credit Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0993 (HB0343) Procurement - Equal Pay Certificates - Requirement Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1126 /CH0470 (HB1615) Frederick County - Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High School Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM