Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Labor and Industry, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0317
Title
Labor and Employment - Wages and Benefits - Preemption of Local Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382 (SB0305)
Title
Commonsense Paid Leave Act
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0398 (SB0404)
Title
Labor and Employment - Salary History Information Disclosures
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1143
Title
Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307 (SB1016)
Title
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1416 (SB0962)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1470
Title
Apprenticeship and Training Council - Apprentice Ratios - Electrical Craft or Trade
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1510
Title
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511 (SB0626)
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1614 (SB1116)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1615 (SB1145)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 (HB0382)
Title
Commonsense Paid Leave Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626 (HB1511)
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0818 /CH0517
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Voluntary Protection Program
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962 (HB1416)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1016 (HB1307)
Title
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1116 (HB1614)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1145 (HB1615)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0317 Labor and Employment - Wages and Benefits - Preemption of Local Authority Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0381 Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew Delegate McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0382 (SB0305) Commonsense Paid Leave Act Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 12:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/10/2017 - 12:30 PM
HB0398 (SB0404) Labor and Employment - Salary History Information Disclosures Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1143 Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2017 Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1307 (SB1016) Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1416 (SB0962) Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen) Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1470 Apprenticeship and Training Council - Apprentice Ratios - Electrical Craft or Trade Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1510 Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1511 (SB0626) Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1614 (SB1116) Maryland Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits Act Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1615 (SB1145) Maryland Fair Scheduling Act Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0305 (HB0382) Commonsense Paid Leave Act President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0626 (HB1511) Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0818 /CH0517 Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Voluntary Protection Program Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0962 (HB1416) Labor and Employment - Payment of Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen) Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1016 (HB1307) Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor Contractors Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1116 (HB1614) Maryland Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1145 (HB1615) Maryland Fair Scheduling Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM