Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Labor and Industry, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 (SB0843)
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174 (SB0095)
Title
Public Utilities – Investor–Owned Utilities – Prevailing Wage
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 (SB0107)
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 (SB0728)
Title
Labor and Employment – Worker Safety and Health – Injury and Illness Prevention Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1326 (SB0727)
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Revisions and Public Health Emergency Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095 (HB0174)
Title
Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 (HB0685)
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0191
Title
Labor and Employment - Hiring - Higher Education Requirements (Give Me a Chance Act)
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0727 (HB1326)
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Revisions and Public Health Emergency Leave
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728 (HB0923)
Title
Labor and Employment - Worker Safety and Health - Injury and Illness Prevention Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843 (HB0067)
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Antiretaliation Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 (SB0843) I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
Finance
HB0174 (SB0095) Public Utilities – Investor–Owned Utilities – Prevailing Wage Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0581 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (31-15)
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0685 (SB0107) Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Economic Matters
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0923 (SB0728) Labor and Employment – Worker Safety and Health – Injury and Illness Prevention Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1326 (SB0727) Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Revisions and Public Health Emergency Leave Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0095 (HB0174) Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (92-42)
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0107 (HB0685) Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0191 Labor and Employment - Hiring - Higher Education Requirements (Give Me a Chance Act) Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0581) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0727 (HB1326) Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Revisions and Public Health Emergency Leave Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0728 (HB0923) Labor and Employment - Worker Safety and Health - Injury and Illness Prevention Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0843 (HB0067) I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Finance
SB0848 Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Antiretaliation Provisions Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 5:04 PM
Click to return on the top page