Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066
Title
Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372
Title
Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for Services
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551 (SB0620)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0909 (SB0582/CH0315)
Title
Pilot Program for Small Business Development by Ex-Offenders
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940 /CH0138 (SB0774)
Title
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942 /CH0140 (SB0772)
Title
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship Maryland
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1145 (SB0903)
Title
State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0910/CH0208)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 /CH0315 (HB0909)
Title
Pilot Program for Small Business Development by Ex-Offenders
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0616
Title
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0620 (HB0551)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624
Title
Task Force to Study the Expansion of Career and Technical Education in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772 (HB0942/CH0140)
Title
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship Maryland
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 (HB0940/CH0138)
Title
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0903 (HB1145)
Title
State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907
Title
Ironworkers - Apprenticeship Program and Certification Program and Use of Certified Ironworkers on Construction Projects
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 /CH0208 (HB1253)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - Study
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2015 - 3:00 PM
Rules
HB0372 Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0391 Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for Services Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0551 (SB0620) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015 Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0596 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0909 (SB0582/CH0315) Pilot Program for Small Business Development by Ex-Offenders Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0940 /CH0138 (SB0774) Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Economic Matters
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0942 /CH0140 (SB0772) Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship Maryland Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Economic Matters
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0985 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1145 (SB0903) State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1253 (SB0910/CH0208) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - Study Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies President 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0582 /CH0315 (HB0909) Pilot Program for Small Business Development by Ex-Offenders Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Finance
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0616 Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0620 (HB0551) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015 Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0624 Task Force to Study the Expansion of Career and Technical Education in Maryland Senator Currie 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0772 (HB0942/CH0140) Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship Maryland President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0774 (HB0940/CH0138) Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training Program President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0903 (HB1145) State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0907 Ironworkers - Apprenticeship Program and Certification Program and Use of Certified Ironworkers on Construction Projects Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0910 /CH0208 (HB1253) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - Study Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM