Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Land Preservation Trusts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 /CH0114
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Easement Termination
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0217 (SB0285)
Title
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Overlay Easements, Rights-of-Way, or Servitudes
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779 (SB0719)
Title
Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1438 (SB0896)
Title
Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 (HB0217)
Title
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Overlay Easements, Rights-of-Way, or Servitudes
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0703 /CH0394
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Participation in the Readiness and Environmental Protection Integration Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0719 (HB0779)
Title
Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0896 (HB1438)
Title
Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local Funds
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0975 /CH0662
Title
Real Property - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Separate Parcels
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1053
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Lower Eastern Shore Conservation and Heritage Center
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0155 /CH0114 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Easement Termination Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0217 (SB0285) Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Overlay Easements, Rights-of-Way, or Servitudes Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0779 (SB0719) Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017 Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1438 (SB0896) Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local Funds Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
SB0285 (HB0217) Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Overlay Easements, Rights-of-Way, or Servitudes Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0703 /CH0394 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Participation in the Readiness and Environmental Protection Integration Program Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0719 (HB0779) Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017 Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0896 (HB1438) Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local Funds Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0975 /CH0662 Real Property - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Separate Parcels Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 662
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1053 Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Lower Eastern Shore Conservation and Heritage Center Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM