Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Land Preservation Trusts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0494
Title
Natural Resources - Land Trust Grant Fund - Grant Awards and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935
Title
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Use of Land - Signs Forbidding Trespassing, Hunting, or the Destruction of Property
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1008
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220
Title
Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 /CH0241
Title
Property Tax Assessments - Conservation Property - Alteration of Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 /CH0129
Title
Agriculture - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058 /CH0130
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0494 Natural Resources - Land Trust Grant Fund - Grant Awards and Funding Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0935 Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Use of Land - Signs Forbidding Trespassing, Hunting, or the Destruction of Property Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1008 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1220 Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 /CH0241 Property Tax Assessments - Conservation Property - Alteration of Definition Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Ways and Means
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 /CH0129 Agriculture - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0058 /CH0130 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM