Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Land Preservation Trusts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017 /CH0026 (SB0244/CH0027)
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 /CH0047
Title
St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 /CH0342
Title
Montgomery County - Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Alterations MC 7-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362
Title
Harford County - Transfer Tax - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0244 /CH0027 (HB0017/CH0026)
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 /CH0026 (SB0244/CH0027) Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement Delegate Arentz 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2020 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0090 /CH0047 St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 47
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0848 /CH0342 Montgomery County - Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Alterations MC 7-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 342
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1362 Harford County - Transfer Tax - Distribution of Proceeds Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
SB0244 /CH0027 (HB0017/CH0026) Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement Senator Gallion 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:37 PM