Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Land Records -see also- Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 (SB0391)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378 /CH0108
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Fund - Easement Restriction - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Stocksdale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621 /CH0625 (SB0627)
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917
Title
Real Property - Property Used for Methamphetamine Production - Disclosure and Quarantine
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1008
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Mortgage Foreclosure Property Values Protection Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 /CH0268 (SB0436/CH0267)
Title
Recordation Taxes - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1455 /CH0687
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028
Title
Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 (HB0106)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0267 (HB1209/CH0268)
Title
Recordation Taxes - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627 (HB0621/CH0625)
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0106 (SB0391) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0378 /CH0108 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Fund - Easement Restriction - Reimbursement Delegate Stocksdale 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0621 /CH0625 (SB0627) Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0917 Real Property - Property Used for Methamphetamine Production - Disclosure and Quarantine Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB0946 Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1008 Real Property - Foreclosure - Mortgage Foreclosure Property Values Protection Act of 2013 Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1209 /CH0268 (SB0436/CH0267) Recordation Taxes - Exemptions Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Ways and Means
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1455 /CH0687 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
SB0028 Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0391 (HB0106) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0436 /CH0267 (HB1209/CH0268) Recordation Taxes - Exemptions Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0627 (HB0621/CH0625) Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM