Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Land Records -see also- Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043 /CH0441
Title
Prince George's County - Deferred Water and Sewer Charges Homeowner Disclosure Act of 2014 PG 413-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 /CH0471
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonpayment of Environmental Citations
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0230
Title
Real Property - Priority of Refinance Mortgage Over Junior Liens - Amount of Refinance Mortgage
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0947
Title
Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1003
Title
Business Regulation - Pet Cemeteries - Establishment and Operational Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1043 /CH0441 Prince George's County - Deferred Water and Sewer Charges Homeowner Disclosure Act of 2014 PG 413-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0141 /CH0471 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonpayment of Environmental Citations Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0230 Real Property - Priority of Refinance Mortgage Over Junior Liens - Amount of Refinance Mortgage Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0947 Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement Senator Young 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1003 Business Regulation - Pet Cemeteries - Establishment and Operational Requirements Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page