Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Land Records -see also- Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028
Title
Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 /CH0088
Title
Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0508 (SB0330)
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576 /CH0398 (SB0525/CH0399)
Title
Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - Clarification
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833 /CH0373 (SB0306/CH0372)
Title
Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Calculation
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920 /CH0396 (SB0509/CH0395)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1017 /CH0369 (SB0256/CH0368)
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners PG 412-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085
Title
Prince George's County - State and County Transfer Taxes - Exemptions PG 429-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1470
Title
Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Purchase of Residence
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 /CH0368 (HB1017/CH0369)
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0306 /CH0372 (HB0833/CH0373)
Title
Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Calculation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330 (HB0508)
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0395 (HB0920/CH0396)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525 /CH0399 (HB0576/CH0398)
Title
Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1047 /CH0602
Title
Task Force to Study Recording Deeds for Victims of Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0044 Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0066 /CH0088 Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0508 (SB0330) Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0576 /CH0398 (SB0525/CH0399) Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - Clarification Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0833 /CH0373 (SB0306/CH0372) Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Calculation Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0920 /CH0396 (SB0509/CH0395) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1017 /CH0369 (SB0256/CH0368) Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners PG 412-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1085 Prince George's County - State and County Transfer Taxes - Exemptions PG 429-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1470 Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Purchase of Residence Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 /CH0368 (HB1017/CH0369) Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners Senator Currie 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0306 /CH0372 (HB0833/CH0373) Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Calculation Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0330 (HB0508) Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 /CH0395 (HB0920/CH0396) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0525 /CH0399 (HB0576/CH0398) Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - Clarification Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1047 /CH0602 Task Force to Study Recording Deeds for Victims of Domestic Violence Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM