Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Land Records -see also- Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0280 (SB0076)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Change of Name
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404 /CH0425 (SB0234)
Title
St. Mary's County - Land Records - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077
Title
Attorney's Liens - Settlement Providing for Conveyance of Real Property - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Prince George's County - Land Bank Authority PG 423-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076 (HB0280)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Change of Name
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 (HB0404/CH0425)
Title
St. Mary's County - Land Records - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803
Title
Frederick County - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0280 (SB0076) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Change of Name Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0320 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0404 /CH0425 (SB0234) St. Mary's County - Land Records - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1077 Attorney's Liens - Settlement Providing for Conveyance of Real Property - Enforcement Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 Prince George's County - Land Bank Authority PG 423-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0076 (HB0280) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Change of Name Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0234 (HB0404/CH0425) St. Mary's County - Land Records - Repeal Senator Waugh 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0803 Frederick County - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM