Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Land Records -see also- Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 /CH0423 (SB0578/CH0424)
Title
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 (SB0883)
Title
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 (SB0954)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1363
Title
State Roads Commission - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Process on Behalf of the Department of Transportation
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 /CH0424 (HB0633/CH0423)
Title
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB1007)
Title
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954 (HB1246)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0633 /CH0423 (SB0578/CH0424) Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1007 (SB0883) Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1246 (SB0954) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1363 State Roads Commission - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Process on Behalf of the Department of Transportation Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
SB0578 /CH0424 (HB0633/CH0423) Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0883 (HB1007) Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0954 (HB1246) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM