Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Land Records -see also- Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149 /CH0082
Title
Real Property - Ground Leases - Required Notifications - Private Transaction Redemptions
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529 (SB0256)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Surcharge on Recordable Instruments
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0678 /CH0301 (SB0289/CH0302)
Title
Real Property - Allegany County - Transfer of Property on Assessment Books
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 (SB0675)
Title
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015
Title
Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification PG/MC 104-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076 /CH0420
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Date of Transfer of Dwelling
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077 /CH0421 (SB1056)
Title
Real Property - Deletion of Unlawful Ownership Restrictions - Exemption From Fees and Surcharges
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084 /CH0424 (SB0154/CH0423)
Title
Real Property – Recordation of Deeds – Assignments of Rents and Assignments of Leases for Security Purposes
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103 (SB0924)
Title
Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182 /CH0441 (SB0806/CH0442)
Title
Real Property - Redemption or Extinguishment of Ground Rents
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1479 /CH0480
Title
Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 /CH0423 (HB1084/CH0424)
Title
Real Property - Recordation of Deeds - Assignments of Rents and Assignments of Leases for Security Purposes
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 (HB0529)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Report
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0543
Title
Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Number of Declarant Votes
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 /CH0566
Title
Real Property - Notice of Easements, Covenants, Restrictions, and Conditions - Recordation
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB0990)
Title
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0806 /CH0442 (HB1182/CH0441)
Title
Real Property - Redemption or Extinguishment of Ground Rents
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 (HB1103)
Title
Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056 (HB1077/CH0421)
Title
Real Property - Deletion of Unlawful Ownership Restrictions - Exemption From Fees and Surcharges
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0149 /CH0082 Real Property - Ground Leases - Required Notifications - Private Transaction Redemptions Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 82
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0529 (SB0256) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Surcharge on Recordable Instruments Delegate McIntosh 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0678 /CH0301 (SB0289/CH0302) Real Property - Allegany County - Transfer of Property on Assessment Books Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 301
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0990 (SB0675) Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1015 Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification PG/MC 104-20 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1076 /CH0420 Homestead Property Tax Credit - Date of Transfer of Dwelling Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 420
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1077 /CH0421 (SB1056) Real Property - Deletion of Unlawful Ownership Restrictions - Exemption From Fees and Surcharges Delegate Forbes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 421
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1084 /CH0424 (SB0154/CH0423) Real Property – Recordation of Deeds – Assignments of Rents and Assignments of Leases for Security Purposes Delegate Holmes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 424
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1103 (SB0924) Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1182 /CH0441 (SB0806/CH0442) Real Property - Redemption or Extinguishment of Ground Rents Delegate Smith 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 441
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1479 /CH0480 Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0154 /CH0423 (HB1084/CH0424) Real Property - Recordation of Deeds - Assignments of Rents and Assignments of Leases for Security Purposes Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 423
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0256 (HB0529) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Report Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0543 Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Number of Declarant Votes Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0570 /CH0566 Real Property - Notice of Easements, Covenants, Restrictions, and Conditions - Recordation Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 (HB0990) Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0806 /CH0442 (HB1182/CH0441) Real Property - Redemption or Extinguishment of Ground Rents Senator Hayes 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0924 (HB1103) Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1056 (HB1077/CH0421) Real Property - Deletion of Unlawful Ownership Restrictions - Exemption From Fees and Surcharges Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/28/2020 11:07 AM