Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Landscape Architects

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658 /CH0279 (SB0608/CH0280)
Title
State House Trust - Duties - Landscaping and Construction of Lawyer's Mall
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0958 (SB0962)
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608 /CH0280 (HB0658/CH0279)
Title
State House Trust – Duties – Landscaping and Construction of Lawyer’s Mall
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962 (HB0958)
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0658 /CH0279 (SB0608/CH0280) State House Trust - Duties - Landscaping and Construction of Lawyer's Mall Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0958 (SB0962) Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0608 /CH0280 (HB0658/CH0279) State House Trust – Duties – Landscaping and Construction of Lawyer’s Mall President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0962 (HB0958) Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM