Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Landscape Architects

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279
Title
Real Property - Restrictions on Use - Low-Impact Landscaping
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681 (SB0368)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858 (SB0249)
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0249 (HB0858)
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0368 (HB0681)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0279 Real Property - Restrictions on Use - Low-Impact Landscaping Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0681 (SB0368) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0858 (SB0249) Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1056 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1)
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
SB0023 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0249 (HB0858) Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0368 (HB0681) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0987 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2020 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/24/2020 8:02 AM