Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Language

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334 /CH0295 (SB0589/CH0294)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661 (SB0995)
Title
Teaching Techniques - Students with Special Needs and Limited English Proficiency
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0698)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964 /CH0658 (SB0410)
Title
Community Colleges - Grants for English for Speakers of Other Languages Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093
Title
Transit Vehicles - Prohibited Acts - Use of Obscene Language
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0410 (HB0964/CH0658)
Title
Community Colleges - Cade Funding Formula - Grants for English for Speakers of Other Languages Programs
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0589 /CH0294 (HB0334/CH0295)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase Transactions
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 (HB0735)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0995 (HB0661)
Title
Teaching Techniques - Students with Special Needs and Limited English Proficiency
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0334 /CH0295 (SB0589/CH0294) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase Transactions Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Economic Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0661 (SB0995) Teaching Techniques - Students with Special Needs and Limited English Proficiency Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 (SB0698) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0964 /CH0658 (SB0410) Community Colleges - Grants for English for Speakers of Other Languages Programs Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 658
Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1093 Transit Vehicles - Prohibited Acts - Use of Obscene Language Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0410 (HB0964/CH0658) Community Colleges - Cade Funding Formula - Grants for English for Speakers of Other Languages Programs Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0589 /CH0294 (HB0334/CH0295) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase Transactions Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0698 (HB0735) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0995 (HB0661) Teaching Techniques - Students with Special Needs and Limited English Proficiency Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM