Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Language -see also- Communication; Electronic Comm; Telecomm

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184 /CH0768
Title
Public Health - Treatment of Attention-Deficit/Hyperactivity Disorder - Identification and Posting of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0482 /CH0515 (SB0385/CH0516)
Title
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0808 (SB0660)
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957 /CH0770 (SB0195)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Verification, Publication, and Notification Requirements (Janet's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968
Title
Children - Health and Safety - Child Abuse and Neglect Hotline and Signage
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1143
Title
Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170
Title
Education - College and Career Readiness Assessment - English Learner Student Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1268
Title
Education - Student Achievement Gap Standard - Establishment (Maryland Student Achievement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1351 (SB0458)
Title
Education - Foreign Language Requirement - Computer Programming Language Courses
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1381 /CH0608 (SB0866/CH0609)
Title
Adult High School Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1502
Title
Task Force to Expand Dual Language Programs in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0496
Title
General Provisions - State Designations - Great Seal
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0193
Title
Physicians - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification and Posting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0385 /CH0516 (HB0482/CH0515)
Title
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0458 (HB1351)
Title
Education - Foreign Language Requirement - Computer Programming Language Courses
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0660 (HB0808)
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1150
Title
Hearing- or Speech-Impaired Children - Sign Language Instruction for Parents and Guardians
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0184 /CH0768 Public Health - Treatment of Attention-Deficit/Hyperactivity Disorder - Identification and Posting of Information Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 768
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0482 /CH0515 (SB0385/CH0516) Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0808 (SB0660) Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0957 /CH0770 (SB0195) State Board of Physicians - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Verification, Publication, and Notification Requirements (Janet's Law) Delegate Miele 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 770
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0968 Children - Health and Safety - Child Abuse and Neglect Hotline and Signage Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1143 Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2017 Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1170 Education - College and Career Readiness Assessment - English Learner Student Exception Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1268 Education - Student Achievement Gap Standard - Establishment (Maryland Student Achievement Act) Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1351 (SB0458) Education - Foreign Language Requirement - Computer Programming Language Courses Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1381 /CH0608 (SB0866/CH0609) Adult High School Pilot Program Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Economic Matters
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1502 Task Force to Expand Dual Language Programs in Maryland Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0088 /CH0496 General Provisions - State Designations - Great Seal Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 496
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0193 Physicians - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification and Posting Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0385 /CH0516 (HB0482/CH0515) Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0458 (HB1351) Education - Foreign Language Requirement - Computer Programming Language Courses Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0660 (HB0808) Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1150 Hearing- or Speech-Impaired Children - Sign Language Instruction for Parents and Guardians Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM