Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Language -see also- Communication; Electronic Comm; Telecomm

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 /CH0374 (SB0043/CH0373)
Title
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 (SB0163/CH0441)
Title
Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 (SB0638)
Title
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503
Title
State Department of Education - Translation Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Education Trust Fund - Use of Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0562 (SB0530)
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642
Title
Education - Dual Language Immersion Program - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 /CH0338 (SB0758/CH0339)
Title
Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1154
Title
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Bilingual Certification and Instruction
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB0664)
Title
Education - Foreign Language Requirement - Computer Programming Language Courses
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1386 /CH0032
Title
Public Schools – Reporting Child Abuse – Telephone Number
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029 /CH0733
Title
State Government - Websites - Language Access
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043 /CH0373 (HB0193/CH0374)
Title
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163 /CH0441 (HB0490)
Title
Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and Certification
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0562)
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0638 (HB0493)
Title
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB1300)
Title
Education - Foreign Language Requirement - Computer Programming Language Courses
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 /CH0339 (HB1087/CH0338)
Title
Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0193 /CH0374 (SB0043/CH0373) High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0490 (SB0163/CH0441) Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and Certification Delegate Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0493 (SB0638) Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0503 State Department of Education - Translation Grant Program - Established Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0557 Primary and Secondary Education - Education Trust Fund - Use of Fund Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0562 (SB0530) Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0642 Education - Dual Language Immersion Program - Authorization Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 /CH0338 (SB0758/CH0339) Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1154 Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Bilingual Certification and Instruction Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1300 (SB0664) Education - Foreign Language Requirement - Computer Programming Language Courses Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1386 /CH0032 Public Schools – Reporting Child Abuse – Telephone Number Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0029 /CH0733 State Government - Websites - Language Access Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 733
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0043 /CH0373 (HB0193/CH0374) High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
SB0163 /CH0441 (HB0490) Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and Certification Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0530 (HB0562) Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0638 (HB0493) Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 (HB1300) Education - Foreign Language Requirement - Computer Programming Language Courses Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 /CH0339 (HB1087/CH0338) Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM