Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Leave

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055
Title
Labor and Employment - Sick Leave Policy - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391 (SB0224/CH0208)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Wellness Program
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495 /CH0478 (SB0476/CH0477)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Unused Sick Leave Calculation - Clarification
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0718 (SB0813/CH0556)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0698)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804 /CH0548 (SB0784/CH0547)
Title
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to Pregnancy
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0956 (SB0719)
Title
State and Local Government - Economic Aid - Award to Employers
Sponsor
Delegate Turner, V.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331
Title
Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1334
Title
Employment Discrimination - Leave for Pregnancy and Childbirth
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1363
Title
State Law Enforcement Officers - Compensatory Leave - Cash Compensation and Creditable Service
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0012 /CH0163
Title
Labor and Employment - Leave - Deployment of Family Members in the Armed Forces
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085 /CH0021
Title
Maryland Port Commission - Management Personnel Appointments - Operating and Managing Port Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0224 /CH0208 (HB0391)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Wellness Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0476 /CH0477 (HB0495/CH0478)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Unused Sick Leave Calculation - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 (HB0735)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0719 (HB0956)
Title
State and Local Government - Economic Aid - Award to Employers
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 /CH0547 (HB0804/CH0548)
Title
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to Pregnancy
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 /CH0556 (HB0718)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick Leave
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 Labor and Employment - Sick Leave Policy - Requirement Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0391 (SB0224/CH0208) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Wellness Program Delegate Krebs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0495 /CH0478 (SB0476/CH0477) State Retirement and Pension System - Unused Sick Leave Calculation - Clarification Delegate Griffith 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 AM
HB0718 (SB0813/CH0556) State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick Leave Delegate Serafini 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2013 - 9:00 AM
HB0735 (SB0698) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0804 /CH0548 (SB0784/CH0547) Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to Pregnancy Delegate Hucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Economic Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0956 (SB0719) State and Local Government - Economic Aid - Award to Employers Delegate Turner, V. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1331 Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child Delegate Kelly, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1334 Employment Discrimination - Leave for Pregnancy and Childbirth Delegate Kelly, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
Appropriations
HB1363 State Law Enforcement Officers - Compensatory Leave - Cash Compensation and Creditable Service Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0012 /CH0163 Labor and Employment - Leave - Deployment of Family Members in the Armed Forces Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Finance
1/24/2013 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0085 /CH0021 Maryland Port Commission - Management Personnel Appointments - Operating and Managing Port Facilities Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Finance
1/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0224 /CH0208 (HB0391) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Wellness Program Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Finance
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0476 /CH0477 (HB0495/CH0478) State Retirement and Pension System - Unused Sick Leave Calculation - Clarification Senator Jones-Rodwell 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2013 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0698 (HB0735) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0719 (HB0956) State and Local Government - Economic Aid - Award to Employers Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0784 /CH0547 (HB0804/CH0548) Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to Pregnancy Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0813 /CH0556 (HB0718) State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick Leave Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM