Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Leave

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194 (SB0195/CH0053)
Title
Carroll County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 (SB0472)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0851
Title
Counties - Paid Sick Leave for Limited-Term Grant-Funded Employees - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0909
Title
Task Force to Study Paid Parental Leave Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1175 (SB0664)
Title
Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits Act
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1379 (SB0813)
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454
Title
Labor and Employment - Organ Donation Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0195 /CH0053 (HB0194)
Title
Carroll County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0472 (HB0580)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB1175)
Title
Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 (HB1379)
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Benefits Study
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0194 (SB0195/CH0053) Carroll County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0580 (SB0472) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Economic Matters
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0851 Counties - Paid Sick Leave for Limited-Term Grant-Funded Employees - Requirement Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0909 Task Force to Study Paid Parental Leave Policies Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1175 (SB0664) Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits Act Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1379 (SB0813) Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1454 Labor and Employment - Organ Donation Leave Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0101 Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0195 /CH0053 (HB0194) Carroll County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Finance
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0472 (HB0580) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 (HB1175) Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0813 (HB1379) Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0875 State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Benefits Study Senator Serafini 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM