Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Leave

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 /CH0001 (SB0230)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0065
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214
Title
Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or Childbirth
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 (SB0580/CH0680)
Title
State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382 (SB0305)
Title
Commonsense Paid Leave Act
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0854
Title
Units of State Government - Award of Grants to Counties - Requirement of Paid Sick Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - Time Period for Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0230 (HB0001/CH0001)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 (HB0382)
Title
Commonsense Paid Leave Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 /CH0680 (HB0324)
Title
State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 /CH0001 (SB0230) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2018
Economic Matters
2/10/2017 - 12:30 PM
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0065 Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0214 Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or Childbirth Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0324 (SB0580/CH0680) State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave Delegate Korman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0382 (SB0305) Commonsense Paid Leave Act Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 12:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/10/2017 - 12:30 PM
HB0854 Units of State Government - Award of Grants to Counties - Requirement of Paid Sick Leave Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1095 Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - Time Period for Eligibility Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0230 (HB0001/CH0001) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0305 (HB0382) Commonsense Paid Leave Act President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0580 /CH0680 (HB0324) State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM