Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Leave

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0098 (SB0135)
Title
Paid Leave Compromise Act of 2018
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 /CH0179
Title
State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing Mothers
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775 (SB0859/CH0752)
Title
State Employees - Parental Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Exemption - Facility With On-Site Health Clinic
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1364
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Calculation of Employees (Fair Sick Leave and Holiday Compensation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1421
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Seasonal Worker Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1525 (SB0727)
Title
State Personnel – Employee Mentoring Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 (HB0098)
Title
Paid Leave Compromise Act of 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0712
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0727 (HB1525)
Title
State Personnel - Employee Mentoring Leave
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0859 /CH0752 (HB0775)
Title
State Employees – Parental Leave
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Entities That Provide Paid Sick Leave
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0098 (SB0135) Paid Leave Compromise Act of 2018 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 /CH0179 State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing Mothers Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Appropriations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0775 (SB0859/CH0752) State Employees - Parental Leave Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0779 Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Exemption - Facility With On-Site Health Clinic Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1364 Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Calculation of Employees (Fair Sick Leave and Holiday Compensation Act) Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1421 Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Seasonal Worker Revisions Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1525 (SB0727) State Personnel – Employee Mentoring Leave Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0135 (HB0098) Paid Leave Compromise Act of 2018 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Finance
SB0712 Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Exemptions Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Finance
SB0727 (HB1525) State Personnel - Employee Mentoring Leave Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0859 /CH0752 (HB0775) State Employees – Parental Leave Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 752
Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0890 Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Entities That Provide Paid Sick Leave Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM