Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Leave

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 (SB0137)
Title
Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0523 (SB0225)
Title
State Personnel - Employee Accommodations - Pregnancy and Childbirth
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0712 (SB0260)
Title
Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave (Family Bereavement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722 (SB0434)
Title
Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0828 (SB0683)
Title
Corrections - Women's Prerelease Unit - Requirements (Women's Prerelease Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0539)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908 (SB0404)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Verification
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 (SB0906)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Seasonal Temporary Workers
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1589
Title
Election Law - Time Off for Employee Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 (HB1410)
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 (HB0407)
Title
Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0225 (HB0523)
Title
State Personnel - Employee Accommodations - Pregnancy and Childbirth
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0260 (HB0712)
Title
Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave (Family Bereavement Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0404 (HB0908)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Verification
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0434 (HB0722)
Title
Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0839)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666
Title
Election Law - Time Off For Employee Voting
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683 (HB0828)
Title
Corrections - Women's Prerelease Unit - Requirements (Women's Prerelease Equity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0906 (HB1021)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Seasonal Temporary Workers
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0163 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 (SB0137) Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0523 (SB0225) State Personnel - Employee Accommodations - Pregnancy and Childbirth Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0712 (SB0260) Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave (Family Bereavement Act) Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0722 (SB0434) Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0828 (SB0683) Corrections - Women's Prerelease Unit - Requirements (Women's Prerelease Equity Act) Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 (SB0539) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0908 (SB0404) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Verification Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 (SB0906) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Seasonal Temporary Workers Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1589 Election Law - Time Off for Employee Voting Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0062 (HB1410) Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 (HB0407) Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0225 (HB0523) State Personnel - Employee Accommodations - Pregnancy and Childbirth Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0260 (HB0712) Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave (Family Bereavement Act) Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0404 (HB0908) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Verification Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0434 (HB0722) Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0539 (HB0839) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0666 Election Law - Time Off For Employee Voting Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 (HB0828) Corrections - Women's Prerelease Unit - Requirements (Women's Prerelease Equity Act) Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0906 (HB1021) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Seasonal Temporary Workers Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1010 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:43 PM