Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legal Aid

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129 (SB0262/CH0035)
Title
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0153
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535
Title
Court Fees - Surcharge on Divorce Petitions - Distribution to the Domestic Violence Program Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838 /CH0072 (SB0640/CH0071)
Title
Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Extension of Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1303 /CH0553 (SB0809/CH0552)
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Establishment of a Consumer Affairs Satellite Office in Prince George's County
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 /CH0035 (HB0129)
Title
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0071 (HB0838/CH0072)
Title
Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Extension of Termination Date
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0809 /CH0552 (HB1303/CH0553)
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0129 (SB0262/CH0035) Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0153 Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0535 Court Fees - Surcharge on Divorce Petitions - Distribution to the Domestic Violence Program Fund Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0838 /CH0072 (SB0640/CH0071) Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Extension of Termination Date Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1303 /CH0553 (SB0809/CH0552) Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0234 Office of the Attorney General - Establishment of a Consumer Affairs Satellite Office in Prince George's County Senator Currie 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0262 /CH0035 (HB0129) Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0071 (HB0838/CH0072) Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Extension of Termination Date Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0809 /CH0552 (HB1303/CH0553) Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM