Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legal Aid

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023 (SB0063)
Title
Task Force to Study the Laws Relating to Representation of Indigent Criminal Defendants by the Office of the Public Defender - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0223 (SB1088)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 (SB0270)
Title
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0537
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release of Criminal Defendants - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public Defender
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for Services
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 (SB0973)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment - Detainee Electronic Information Sharing System
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1277
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063 (HB0023)
Title
Task Force to Study the Laws Relating to Representation of Indigent Criminal Defendants by the Office of the Public Defender - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Getty
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 (HB0358)
Title
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681
Title
Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748
Title
Criminal Procedure - District Court Commissioner - Initial Appearance
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0973 (HB1232)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1088 (HB0355/CH0223)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1093
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1114
Title
Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public Defender
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0023 (SB0063) Task Force to Study the Laws Relating to Representation of Indigent Criminal Defendants by the Office of the Public Defender - Extension Delegate Vallario 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0235 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0355 /CH0223 (SB1088) Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0358 (SB0270) Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0537 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release of Criminal Defendants - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public Defender Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0985 Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for Services Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1232 (SB0973) Criminal Procedure - Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment - Detainee Electronic Information Sharing System Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1277 Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0063 (HB0023) Task Force to Study the Laws Relating to Representation of Indigent Criminal Defendants by the Office of the Public Defender - Extension Senator Getty 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0270 (HB0358) Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal Services Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0748 Criminal Procedure - District Court Commissioner - Initial Appearance Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0973 (HB1232) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1088 (HB0355/CH0223) Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1093 State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal Services Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1114 Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public Defender Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM