Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legal Aid

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074 /CH0397
Title
Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship Program - Expansion of Scope
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0337 (SB0366)
Title
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0468)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial Appearance
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for Services
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496 (SB0942)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial Appearance
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0530
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667
Title
Higher Education Institutions - Sexual Assault, Violence, and Stalking - Prevention and Outreach Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 (SB0817)
Title
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Policies - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1119 (SB0646)
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Caseload Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 (HB0337)
Title
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468 (HB0348)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0646 (HB1119)
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Caseload Standards
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0817 (HB0749)
Title
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Policies - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0942 (HB0496)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial Appearance
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0074 /CH0397 Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship Program - Expansion of Scope Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Ways and Means
2/05/2015 - 2:15 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0337 (SB0366) Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0348 (SB0468) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0361 Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial Appearance Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judiciary
HB0391 Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for Services Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0496 (SB0942) Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial Appearance Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0530 Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0596 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0667 Higher Education Institutions - Sexual Assault, Violence, and Stalking - Prevention and Outreach Policies Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0749 (SB0817) Higher Education - Sexual Assault Policies - Reporting Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1119 (SB0646) Office of the Public Defender - Caseload Standards Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Judiciary
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0366 (HB0337) Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0468 (HB0348) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0646 (HB1119) Office of the Public Defender - Caseload Standards Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0735 Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility - Requirements Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0817 (HB0749) Higher Education - Sexual Assault Policies - Reporting Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0942 (HB0496) Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial Appearance Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM