Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legal Aid

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551 /CH0271
Title
Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Mediation
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 (SB0472)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0591
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for Services
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 (SB0801)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866 (SB0833)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515
Title
Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Indigency Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1582 (SB1071)
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Caseload Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1634 /CH0655 (SB1072)
Title
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1638
Title
Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0472 (HB0580)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 (HB0796)
Title
Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 (HB0866)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1071 (HB1582)
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Caseload Standards
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1072 (HB1634/CH0655)
Title
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1134
Title
Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - Costs for Appointed Legal Representation
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1156
Title
Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public Defender
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements Speaker 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/02/2016 - 12:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0551 /CH0271 Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Mediation Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0580 (SB0472) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Economic Matters
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0589 Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0591 Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for Services Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0796 (SB0801) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0866 (SB0833) Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic Violence Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1515 Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Indigency Determinations Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1582 (SB1071) Office of the Public Defender - Caseload Standards Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1634 /CH0655 (SB1072) Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System Delegate Jalisi 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1638 Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - Funding Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0472 (HB0580) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0801 (HB0796) Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0833 (HB0866) Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic Violence Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1071 (HB1582) Office of the Public Defender - Caseload Standards Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1072 (HB1634/CH0655) Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1134 Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - Costs for Appointed Legal Representation Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1156 Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public Defender Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/11/2016 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM