Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legal Aid

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272
Title
Higher Education - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Sanctuary Campus Status
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428 (SB0574)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839
Title
Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972 /CH0798 (SB0811/CH0797)
Title
Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Repeal of Sunset
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 (SB0382/CH0280)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065
Title
Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215 (SB0983)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231
Title
Indigent Defendants - Caseloads - Panel Attorney Program
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291 (SB0856/CH0839)
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382 /CH0280 (HB0991)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite Organizations
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574 (HB0428)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 /CH0797 (HB0972/CH0798)
Title
Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Repeal of Sunset
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0856 /CH0839 (HB1291)
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0983 (HB1215)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0272 Higher Education - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Sanctuary Campus Status Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0428 (SB0574) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0839 Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - Provisional Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0972 /CH0798 (SB0811/CH0797) Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Repeal of Sunset Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 798
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0991 (SB0382/CH0280) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite Organizations Delegate Lierman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1065 Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1215 (SB0983) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1231 Indigent Defendants - Caseloads - Panel Attorney Program Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1291 (SB0856/CH0839) Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0382 /CH0280 (HB0991) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite Organizations Senator McFadden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
SB0574 (HB0428) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0811 /CH0797 (HB0972/CH0798) Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Repeal of Sunset Senator Zirkin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 797
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0856 /CH0839 (HB1291) Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0983 (HB1215) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM