Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legal Aid

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 /CH0004 (SB0002/CH0003)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0578
Title
Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942
Title
Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential Tenancy
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335
Title
Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392 (SB0864/CH0682)
Title
Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1524 (SB1134)
Title
Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0003 (HB0001/CH0004)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 /CH0394 (HB0913/CH0395)
Title
Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0864 /CH0682 (HB1392)
Title
Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1134 (HB1524)
Title
Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 /CH0004 (SB0002/CH0003) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0578 Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0942 Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential Tenancy Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1335 Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1392 (SB0864/CH0682) Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures Delegate Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1524 (SB1134) Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0002 /CH0003 (HB0001/CH0004) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Judicial Proceedings
1/11/2018 - 1:15 PM
Judiciary
SB0607 /CH0394 (HB0913/CH0395) Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings Provisions Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0864 /CH0682 (HB1392) Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
Finance
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1134 (HB1524) Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM