Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legal Aid

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036 /CH0035
Title
Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 (SB0581)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323 (SB0591)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition to Modify or Reduce Sentence (Maryland Second Look Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533 (SB0518)
Title
Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535
Title
Anne Arundel County Public Schools - Preventive Measure Unit Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 (SB0684)
Title
Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0918 /CH0369 (SB1048)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1166
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Diversion Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181 /CH0440
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Data Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231 (SB0949)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1373
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Legal Counsel and Chief Budget Analyst
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1517
Title
Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program - Social Services
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1576 (SB0731)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Committed Persons - Release Proceedings
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 /CH0501
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 (HB0533)
Title
Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 (HB0170)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591 (HB0323)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition to Modify or Reduce Sentence (Maryland Second Look Act)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB0801)
Title
Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0731 (HB1576)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Committed Persons - Release Proceedings
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949 (HB1231)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1048 (HB0918/CH0369)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0036 /CH0035 Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs Delegate Barron 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 35
Judiciary
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0170 (SB0581) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0323 (SB0591) Criminal Procedure - Petition to Modify or Reduce Sentence (Maryland Second Look Act) Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0533 (SB0518) Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act) Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0535 Anne Arundel County Public Schools - Preventive Measure Unit Pilot Program Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0801 (SB0684) Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act) Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0918 /CH0369 (SB1048) Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense Delegate Wilson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 369
Judiciary
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1166 Public Safety - Law Enforcement Diversion Programs Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1181 /CH0440 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Data Collection Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 440
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1231 (SB0949) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1322 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act) Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
HB1373 Baltimore County Board of Education - Legal Counsel and Chief Budget Analyst Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1517 Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program - Social Services Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1576 (SB0731) Criminal Procedure - Committed Persons - Release Proceedings Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0023 /CH0501 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0518 (HB0533) Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 (HB0170) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
SB0591 (HB0323) Criminal Procedure - Petition to Modify or Reduce Sentence (Maryland Second Look Act) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0684 (HB0801) Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act) Senator Washington 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0731 (HB1576) Criminal Procedure - Committed Persons - Release Proceedings Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0949 (HB1231) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1048 (HB0918/CH0369) Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 11:16 AM