Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legislation -see also- Correct Leg; Cur Leg; Emerg Bills

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278 (SB0391)
Title
General Assembly Standing Committees - Posting of Written Testimony on Web Site
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367
Title
Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0420 (SB0303)
Title
Commonsense Spending Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 /CH0004 (SB0371/CH0550)
Title
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0984 (SB0475)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1423 /CH0310
Title
Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed Legislation
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1641
Title
Corporations and Associations - Nonprofit Corporations - Legislative Advocacy
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0303 (HB0420)
Title
Commonsense Spending Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0340 /CH0559 (HB1225/CH0558)
Title
University of Maryland School of Public Health, Center for Health Equity - Workgroup on Health in All Policies
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 /CH0550 (HB0503/CH0004)
Title
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 (HB0278)
Title
General Assembly Standing Committees - Posting of Written Testimony on Web Site
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0401 /CH0271 (HB0815/CH0272)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Membership Elections
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0475 (HB0984)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690
Title
State Budget
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092
Title
Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1197
Title
Public Health - Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission - Membership, Licensing, and Studies
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0278 (SB0391) General Assembly Standing Committees - Posting of Written Testimony on Web Site Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0367 Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0420 (SB0303) Commonsense Spending Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0503 /CH0004 (SB0371/CH0550) State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Appropriations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0984 (SB0475) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
Appropriations
HB1423 /CH0310 Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed Legislation Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1641 Corporations and Associations - Nonprofit Corporations - Legislative Advocacy Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0303 (HB0420) Commonsense Spending Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0340 /CH0559 (HB1225/CH0558) University of Maryland School of Public Health, Center for Health Equity - Workgroup on Health in All Policies Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Finance
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0371 /CH0550 (HB0503/CH0004) State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0391 (HB0278) General Assembly Standing Committees - Posting of Written Testimony on Web Site Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0401 /CH0271 (HB0815/CH0272) State Retirement and Pension System - Membership Elections Senator Guzzone 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0475 (HB0984) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0690 State Budget Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
SB1092 Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1197 Public Health - Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission - Membership, Licensing, and Studies Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM