Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation -see also- Correct Leg; Cur Leg; Emerg Bills

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726 (SB0550)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 /CH0618 (SB0421/CH0619)
Title
Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977 (SB0981)
Title
Workgroup to Study Long-Term Care Medicaid Eligibility and Payments to Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319 /CH0459
Title
Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0421 /CH0619 (HB0735/CH0618)
Title
Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB0726)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664
Title
Declaration of Rights - Right to Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0981 (HB0977)
Title
Workgroup to Study Long-Term Care Medicaid Eligibility and Payments to Providers
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0169 Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0726 (SB0550) Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 /CH0618 (SB0421/CH0619) Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0977 (SB0981) Workgroup to Study Long-Term Care Medicaid Eligibility and Payments to Providers Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1319 /CH0459 Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners Delegate Anderton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0421 /CH0619 (HB0735/CH0618) Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0550 (HB0726) Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0664 Declaration of Rights - Right to Privacy Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
SB0981 (HB0977) Workgroup to Study Long-Term Care Medicaid Eligibility and Payments to Providers Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:34 PM