Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legislative Policy Committee

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1348 /CH0680
Title
Maryland Program Evaluation Act - Revisions and Clarifications
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839
Title
General Assembly and Department of Legislative Services - Reduction in Paper Use
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1348 /CH0680 Maryland Program Evaluation Act - Revisions and Clarifications Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0839 General Assembly and Department of Legislative Services - Reduction in Paper Use Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Rules
3/13/2013 - 9:00 AM
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM