Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legislative Policy Committee

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH0531 (SB0600/CH0530)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001 /CH0630 (SB0910)
Title
Education - Federal Elementary and Secondary Education Act - Waiver Requests
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0530 (HB0742/CH0531)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 (HB1001/CH0630)
Title
Education - Federal Elementary and Secondary Education Act - Waiver Requests
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0742 /CH0531 (SB0600/CH0530) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1001 /CH0630 (SB0910) Education - Federal Elementary and Secondary Education Act - Waiver Requests Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0600 /CH0530 (HB0742/CH0531) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0910 (HB1001/CH0630) Education - Federal Elementary and Secondary Education Act - Waiver Requests Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM