Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Libel and Slander

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131 /CH0096
Title
Commercial Law - Nondisparagement Clauses in Consumer Contracts - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0764 /CH0229
Title
Education - Student Journalists - Freedom of Speech and Freedom of the Press
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0131 /CH0096 Commercial Law - Nondisparagement Clauses in Consumer Contracts - Prohibition Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0764 /CH0229 Education - Student Journalists - Freedom of Speech and Freedom of the Press Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM