Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Libel and Slander

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050 /CH0131
Title
Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057 (SB0556)
Title
State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181 /CH0027 (SB0103/CH0026)
Title
Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0486 /CH0055 (SB0541)
Title
Education - Personnel Matters - Child Sexual Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103 /CH0026 (HB0181/CH0027)
Title
Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 (HB0486/CH0055)
Title
Education - Personnel Matters - Child Sexual Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 (HB0057)
Title
State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0050 /CH0131 Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0057 (SB0556) State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB0181 /CH0027 (SB0103/CH0026) Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0) Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0486 /CH0055 (SB0541) Education - Personnel Matters - Child Sexual Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Ways and Means
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0103 /CH0026 (HB0181/CH0027) Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0) Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0541 (HB0486/CH0055) Education - Personnel Matters - Child Sexual Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 (HB0057) State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM