Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Libel and Slander

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1040 (SB0763)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071 (SB0696)
Title
Public Health - Substance-Related Disorder Services (Maryland Patient Protection and Treatment Ethics Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102 (SB0766)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1115 (SB0436)
Title
Courts - Improperly Summoning a Police Officer - Civil Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 (HB1115)
Title
Courts - Improperly Summoning a Police Officer - Civil Liability
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0696 (HB1071)
Title
Public Health - Substance-Related Disorder Services (Maryland Patient Protection and Treatment Ethics Act)
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 (HB1040)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB1102)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1040 (SB0763) State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1071 (SB0696) Public Health - Substance-Related Disorder Services (Maryland Patient Protection and Treatment Ethics Act) Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1102 (SB0766) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists Act Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1115 (SB0436) Courts - Improperly Summoning a Police Officer - Civil Liability Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0436 (HB1115) Courts - Improperly Summoning a Police Officer - Civil Liability Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0696 (HB1071) Public Health - Substance-Related Disorder Services (Maryland Patient Protection and Treatment Ethics Act) Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0763 (HB1040) State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0766 (HB1102) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists Act Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/13/2020 7:02 PM