Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Libraries -see also- Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005 (SB0184)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Pyramid Atlantic Art Center Space at the Silver Spring Library
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0491 /CH0120
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 (SB0633/CH0512)
Title
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost Share
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 /CH0648
Title
Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146 /CH0669
Title
Task Force to Study Locating Businesses in Libraries in Prince George's County PG 415-13
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0184 (HB0005)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Pyramid Atlantic Art Center Space at the Silver Spring Library
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 /CH0277
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633 /CH0512 (HB0685)
Title
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost Share
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1055
Title
State Aid for Critical Services - County Maintenance of Effort Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 (SB0184) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Pyramid Atlantic Art Center Space at the Silver Spring Library Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB0491 /CH0120 Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0685 (SB0633/CH0512) Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost Share Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0895 /CH0648 Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1146 /CH0669 Task Force to Study Locating Businesses in Libraries in Prince George's County PG 415-13 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0184 (HB0005) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Pyramid Atlantic Art Center Space at the Silver Spring Library Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 AM
SB0445 Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Requirements and Limitations Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 /CH0277 Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0633 /CH0512 (HB0685) Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost Share Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1055 State Aid for Critical Services - County Maintenance of Effort Requirements Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM