Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Libraries -see also- Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0244 (SB0776)
Title
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334 (SB0550)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Pyramid Atlantic Art Center Space at the Silver Spring Library
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0606
Title
Education - Deaf Culture Digital Library
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833 /CH0617
Title
Baltimore City - Tax-Exempt Property - Certification of Use
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0950 /CH0433
Title
Property Tax - Charitable, Educational, or Religious Properties - Tax on Formerly Exempt Property
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1063 (SB0430/CH0500)
Title
Libraries - Regional Resource Centers and County Public Libraries - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110
Title
Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131 (SB1087)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Delmar Public Library
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1242 (SB0419/CH0498)
Title
Libraries - Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1517 (SB1019)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - East Baltimore Historical Library
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0327
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Anne Arundel County - South River High School Media Center
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419 /CH0498 (HB1242)
Title
Libraries - Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0430 /CH0500 (HB1063)
Title
Libraries - Regional Resource Centers and County Public Libraries - Funding
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB0334)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Pyramid Atlantic Art Center Space at the Silver Spring Library
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776 (HB0244)
Title
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory Practices
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1019 (HB1517)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - East Baltimore Historical Library
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1059
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2010, 2012, and 2013 - Maryland Historical Trust Easements
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1081
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Montgomery County - Pyramid Atlantic Art Center Space at the Silver Spring Library
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1087 (HB1131)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Delmar Public Library
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0244 (SB0776) Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory Practices Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0334 (SB0550) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Pyramid Atlantic Art Center Space at the Silver Spring Library Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0653 /CH0606 Education - Deaf Culture Digital Library Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Ways and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0833 /CH0617 Baltimore City - Tax-Exempt Property - Certification of Use Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0950 /CH0433 Property Tax - Charitable, Educational, or Religious Properties - Tax on Formerly Exempt Property Delegate Hogan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1063 (SB0430/CH0500) Libraries - Regional Resource Centers and County Public Libraries - Funding Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1110 Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1131 (SB1087) Creation of a State Debt - Delmar Public Library Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB1242 (SB0419/CH0498) Libraries - Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped - Funding Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1517 (SB1019) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - East Baltimore Historical Library Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 5:00 PM
SB0327 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Anne Arundel County - South River High School Media Center Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0419 /CH0498 (HB1242) Libraries - Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped - Funding Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0430 /CH0500 (HB1063) Libraries - Regional Resource Centers and County Public Libraries - Funding Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 (HB0334) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Pyramid Atlantic Art Center Space at the Silver Spring Library Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 10:00 AM
SB0776 (HB0244) Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory Practices Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1019 (HB1517) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - East Baltimore Historical Library Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 4:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 4:00 PM
SB1059 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2010, 2012, and 2013 - Maryland Historical Trust Easements Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1081 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Montgomery County - Pyramid Atlantic Art Center Space at the Silver Spring Library Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1087 (HB1131) Creation of a State Debt - Delmar Public Library Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM