Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Libraries -see also- Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0138 (SB0338)
Title
Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Education Article of the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144 (SB0337/CH0549)
Title
Libraries - Regional, State, and County - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1225 (SB1137)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Noyes Children's Library Renovation and Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1375
Title
Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1401 /CH0715 (SB1171/CH0714)
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Hours of Operation - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1402 /CH0032 (SB1125)
Title
Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 /CH0549 (HB0144)
Title
Libraries - Regional, State, and County - Funding
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338 (HB0138)
Title
Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Education Article of the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1125 (HB1402/CH0032)
Title
Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1137 (HB1225)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Noyes Children's Library Renovation and Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1171 /CH0714 (HB1401/CH0715)
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Hours of Operation - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0138 (SB0338) Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Education Article of the Annotated Code of Maryland Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0144 (SB0337/CH0549) Libraries - Regional, State, and County - Funding Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB1225 (SB1137) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Noyes Children's Library Renovation and Expansion Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB1375 Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1401 /CH0715 (SB1171/CH0714) Enoch Pratt Free Library - Hours of Operation - Funding Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715
Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1402 /CH0032 (SB1125) Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement Act Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32
Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0337 /CH0549 (HB0144) Libraries - Regional, State, and County - Funding Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0338 (HB0138) Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Education Article of the Annotated Code of Maryland Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1125 (HB1402/CH0032) Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement Act Senator Ferguson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1137 (HB1225) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Noyes Children's Library Renovation and Expansion Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 AM
SB1171 /CH0714 (HB1401/CH0715) Enoch Pratt Free Library - Hours of Operation - Funding Senator Pugh 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM