Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Libraries -see also- Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 /CH0329
Title
Baltimore City - Public Schools and City Council - Logistical and Financial Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0945
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Vendor Contribution to Education Trust Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029 (SB0688)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Noyes Children's Library Renovation
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0724)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Takoma Park Library
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094 /CH0338 (SB0587/CH0337)
Title
Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587 /CH0337 (HB1094/CH0338)
Title
Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688 (HB1029)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Noyes Children's Library Renovation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0724 (HB1089)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Takoma Park Library
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0685 /CH0329 Baltimore City - Public Schools and City Council - Logistical and Financial Assistance Delegate Conaway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0945 Baltimore City Public Schools Vendor Contribution to Education Trust Fund Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1029 (SB0688) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Noyes Children's Library Renovation Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB1089 (SB0724) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Takoma Park Library Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB1094 /CH0338 (SB0587/CH0337) Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Ways and Means
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0587 /CH0337 (HB1094/CH0338) Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0688 (HB1029) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Noyes Children's Library Renovation Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB0724 (HB1089) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Takoma Park Library Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM