Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Libraries -see also- Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 (SB0262)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Heritage Frederick Capital Improvements
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136
Title
St. Mary's County - Board of Library Trustees
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0485 (SB0623)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Village Learning Place
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 /CH0540
Title
Somerset County - Fines and Forfeitures - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0684 (SB0771)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Noyes Children's Library Renovation
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272 (SB0738)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Takoma Park Library
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 (HB0127)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Heritage Frederick Capital Improvements
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0453 /CH0192
Title
Insurance Article - References to Vehicles and Automobiles - Consistency
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0623 (HB0485)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Village Learning Place
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738 (HB1272)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Takoma Park Library
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB0684)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Noyes Children's Library Renovation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0127 (SB0262) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Heritage Frederick Capital Improvements Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2018 - 10:30 AM
HB0136 St. Mary's County - Board of Library Trustees St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0485 (SB0623) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Village Learning Place Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2018 - 10:30 AM
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0631 /CH0540 Somerset County - Fines and Forfeitures - Distribution Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0684 (SB0771) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Noyes Children's Library Renovation Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
HB1272 (SB0738) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Takoma Park Library Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0262 (HB0127) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Heritage Frederick Capital Improvements Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0453 /CH0192 Insurance Article - References to Vehicles and Automobiles - Consistency Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0623 (HB0485) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Village Learning Place Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2018 - 9:00 AM
SB0738 (HB1272) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Takoma Park Library Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
SB0771 (HB0684) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Noyes Children's Library Renovation Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM