Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Libraries -see also- Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292 /CH0620 (SB0338/CH0621)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Proximity to Places of Worship, Schools, Public Libraries, or Youth Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094 (SB0793/CH0025)
Title
Community Safety and Strengthening Act
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1294 (SB0840)
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330 /CH0038 (SB0594/CH0039)
Title
State Law Library - Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075
Title
Juvenile Services Education Program - Employees - Employment Contracts and Leave
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338 /CH0621 (HB0292/CH0620)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Proximity to Places of Worship, Schools, Public Libraries, or Youth Centers
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0594 /CH0039 (HB1330/CH0038)
Title
State Law Library - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735
Title
State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 /CH0025 (HB1094)
Title
Community Safety and Strengthening Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 (HB1294)
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0292 /CH0620 (SB0338/CH0621) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Proximity to Places of Worship, Schools, Public Libraries, or Youth Centers Delegate Otto 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1094 (SB0793/CH0025) Community Safety and Strengthening Act Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 11:30 a.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2019 - 11:30 AM
HB1294 (SB0840) Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1330 /CH0038 (SB0594/CH0039) State Law Library - Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0075 Juvenile Services Education Program - Employees - Employment Contracts and Leave Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Finance
1/24/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0338 /CH0621 (HB0292/CH0620) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Proximity to Places of Worship, Schools, Public Libraries, or Youth Centers Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0594 /CH0039 (HB1330/CH0038) State Law Library - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0735 State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
SB0793 /CH0025 (HB1094) Community Safety and Strengthening Act Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0840 (HB1294) Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM