Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Libraries -see also- Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0119
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401 (SB0758)
Title
Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419
Title
Higher Education - Report on Collection Practices for Unpaid Fees and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0440 /CH0208
Title
St. Mary's County Open Meetings Act - Public Agencies and Use of New Technology
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 /CH0272 (SB0326/CH0273)
Title
State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957 (SB1005)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Net Neutrality Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1000 (SB0524)
Title
Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 (SB0851/CH0586)
Title
Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0326 /CH0273 (HB0604/CH0272)
Title
State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0466
Title
Public Libraries - State Library Resource Center - Funding
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 (HB1000)
Title
Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB0401)
Title
Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851 /CH0586 (HB1003)
Title
Human Services – Department of Disabilities – Accessibility Programs
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 (HB0957)
Title
Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1075
Title
Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1081 /CH0595
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0119 Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB0401 (SB0758) Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act) Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0419 Higher Education - Report on Collection Practices for Unpaid Fees and Services Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0440 /CH0208 St. Mary's County Open Meetings Act - Public Agencies and Use of New Technology St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 208
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0604 /CH0272 (SB0326/CH0273) State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations Delegate Forbes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 272
Ways and Means
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0957 (SB1005) Commercial Law - Maryland Net Neutrality Act of 2020 Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1000 (SB0524) Building Lifelong Library Learners Act Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1003 (SB0851/CH0586) Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0326 /CH0273 (HB0604/CH0272) State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 273
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 285
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0466 Public Libraries - State Library Resource Center - Funding Senator King 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0524 (HB1000) Building Lifelong Library Learners Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
SB0758 (HB0401) Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0851 /CH0586 (HB1003) Human Services – Department of Disabilities – Accessibility Programs Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB1005 (HB0957) Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1075 Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1081 /CH0595 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:28 PM