Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

License Plates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0051
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed Forces
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320 /CH0033 (SB0217/CH0032)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore County
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0374 (SB0212/CH0206)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Motorcycles - Individuals with Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0562
Title
Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate
Sponsor
Delegate Elliott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates - Vehicle Manufactured Without Means to Display Front Plate
Sponsor
Delegate Elliott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0274 (SB0460/CH0273)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770 (SB0742/CH0312)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977 (SB0039/CH0170)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Special Vintage Reproduction Registration Plate
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039 /CH0170 (HB0977)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Special Vintage Reproduction Registration Plate
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212 /CH0206 (HB0374)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Motorcycles - Individuals with Disabilities
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217 /CH0032 (HB0320/CH0033)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore County
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 /CH0273 (HB0723/CH0274)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0742 /CH0312 (HB0770)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0051 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed Forces Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0320 /CH0033 (SB0217/CH0032) Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore County Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0374 (SB0212/CH0206) Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Motorcycles - Individuals with Disabilities Delegate Malone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0562 Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate Delegate Elliott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0577 Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates - Vehicle Manufactured Without Means to Display Front Plate Delegate Elliott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0723 /CH0274 (SB0460/CH0273) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice Delegate Tarrant 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0770 (SB0742/CH0312) Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore City Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0977 (SB0039/CH0170) Motor Vehicle Registration - Special Vintage Reproduction Registration Plate Delegate McDermott 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0039 /CH0170 (HB0977) Motor Vehicle Registration - Special Vintage Reproduction Registration Plate Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0212 /CH0206 (HB0374) Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Motorcycles - Individuals with Disabilities Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0217 /CH0032 (HB0320/CH0033) Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore County Senator Klausmeier 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0460 /CH0273 (HB0723/CH0274) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0742 /CH0312 (HB0770) Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore City Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM