Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

License Plates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077
Title
Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0095
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed Forces
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289 (SB0699/CH0192)
Title
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320
Title
Vehicle Laws - Displaying Front Registration Plate - Exemption for Class L (Historic) and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Elliott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0327
Title
Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate
Sponsor
Delegate Elliott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Appalachian Trail
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350 /CH0490
Title
Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 /CH0192 (HB0289)
Title
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773
Title
Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the Road
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0077 Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0095 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed Forces Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0289 (SB0699/CH0192) Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0320 Vehicle Laws - Displaying Front Registration Plate - Exemption for Class L (Historic) and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles Delegate Elliott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0327 Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate Delegate Elliott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0004 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Appalachian Trail Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0350 /CH0490 Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014 Senator Brochin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0699 /CH0192 (HB0289) Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0773 Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the Road Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM