Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

License Plates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343
Title
Motor Vehicles - Special Deafness Registration Plate
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947
Title
Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local Jurisdictions
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0958
Title
Public Safety - Gun Shows - Captured Plate Data
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1398
Title
Public Safety - Police Profiling - "Right-to-Carry" Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1401
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed Forces
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1447 /CH0758
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Registration Plates - Return
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1645
Title
Task Force to Study Mental Health Concerns for Deaf and Hard of Hearing Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0343 Motor Vehicles - Special Deafness Registration Plate Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0947 Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local Jurisdictions Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0958 Public Safety - Gun Shows - Captured Plate Data Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1398 Public Safety - Police Profiling - "Right-to-Carry" Permit Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1401 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed Forces Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1447 /CH0758 Motor Vehicle Administration - Registration Plates - Return Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 758
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1645 Task Force to Study Mental Health Concerns for Deaf and Hard of Hearing Individuals Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM