Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

License Plates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0031
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Fund - Hunger Relief Initiatives
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200 /CH0106 (SB0859/CH0107)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plate Frames and Borders - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0646 /CH0286
Title
Vehicle Registration - Special Plates for Veterans - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0875
Title
Montgomery County - Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization MC 24-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1148
Title
Vehicle Laws - Military Surplus Vehicles - Registration and Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1264
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0650
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents - Out-of-State Vehicle Titles and Registrations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0819
Title
Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0842
Title
Vehicle Laws - Digital Registration Plates - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0859 /CH0107 (HB0200/CH0106)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plate Frames and Borders - Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0031 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Fund - Hunger Relief Initiatives Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0200 /CH0106 (SB0859/CH0107) Vehicle Laws - Registration Plate Frames and Borders - Enforcement Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 106
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0646 /CH0286 Vehicle Registration - Special Plates for Veterans - Fees Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 286
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0875 Montgomery County - Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization MC 24-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1148 Vehicle Laws - Military Surplus Vehicles - Registration and Operation Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1264 Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0650 Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents - Out-of-State Vehicle Titles and Registrations Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0819 Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0842 Vehicle Laws - Digital Registration Plates - Prohibited Acts Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0859 /CH0107 (HB0200/CH0106) Vehicle Laws - Registration Plate Frames and Borders - Enforcement Senator Sydnor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 107
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:15 PM